U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fresquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.