U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jordan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
September, 2022
  • September 17, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.