U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monroe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Reconsideration]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.