U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavarillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.