U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01820-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coriz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 03, 2023: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 25, 2022: [Suppress]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 25, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.