U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Solis-Marquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.