U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01887-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 20, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.