U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01713-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • December 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Suppress]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.