U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-02646-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gwaltney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • February 18, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.