U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sullivan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.