U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01712-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gachupin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.