U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-01213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lovato
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.