U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes-Abarca
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Terminating Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.