U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ponce-Aguilar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.