U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paulino
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Discovery Order]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.