U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morales-Quinones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Vacate]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • February 14, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.