U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Sierra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • July 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 20, 2022: [Vacate]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • February 14, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.