U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Camacho
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 17, 2022: [Release from Custody]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.