U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Astorga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.