U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guizar-Anchondo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion (with Video Streaming)]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 25, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.