U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 18, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.