U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01827-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Norton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.