U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rocha-Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order to Prepare Petty PSR (Text Only)]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.