U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment NOV]
  • November 15, 2022: [Court's Jury Instructions]
  • November 02, 2022: [Reply to Response]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment NOV]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Return of Exhibits]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 29, 2022: [Jury Notes]
  • September 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 11, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 02, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 02, 2022: [Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • July 29, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 18, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • July 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2022: [In Limine]
  • July 01, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Discovery Order]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.