U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aragon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.