U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villa-Chavez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
  • June 06, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • May 31, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 25, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.