U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lazarin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • May 26, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • May 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 26, 2022: [Extend (other)]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.