U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ross
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Minute Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 07, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.