U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dominguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 25, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 16, 2022: [Seal Document]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.