U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-02056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 07, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Minute Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.