U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arredondo-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 16, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • February 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.