U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00181-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Orona Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 06, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.