U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.