U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosales-Gutierrez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Discovery Order]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.