U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aragon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.