U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alderete
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 29, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.