U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00191-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cobb
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.