U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ringleb
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2025: [Release from Custody]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 17, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 17, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.