U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jefferson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.