U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00185-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nichols
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.