U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Candelaria
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2022: [Discovery Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.