U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01824-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guerrero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 26, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • September 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2022: [Quash]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 22, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • July 18, 2022: [Minute Order]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • June 01, 2022: [Disclosure]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Detention Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.