U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holguin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 05, 2023: [Release from Custody]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 10, 2022: [Release from Custody]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.