U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01828-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric/Psychological Exam]
  • April 12, 2022: [Psychiatric/Psychological Exam]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 15, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.