U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • May 18, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Reconsideration]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.