U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Pretrial Services - Memo/Violation Report (Information Only)]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • February 23, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.