U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Melgar-Melgar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.