U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00236-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leon-Carbajal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.