U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00234-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castillo-Campos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Seal]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Minute Order]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.