U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00230-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zarate-Escobedo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order to Prepare Petty PSR (Text Only)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.